THE SEARLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 288541
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £112.30k £113.28k £126.03k £137.06k £145.93k
Total expenditure £89.86k £95.38k £97.69k £100.24k £183.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A