BLACKFRIARS OVERSEAS AID TRUST

Charity number: 288585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 May 2017 On time Download