THE REHABILITATION TRUST

Charity number: 288622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.60m £2.66m £3.59m £4.05m £4.85m
Total expenditure £2.63m £2.66m £3.54m £4.04m £4.82m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.60m £2.66m £3.59m £4.05m £4.85m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.60m £0 £3.59m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.63m £2.65m £3.54m £4.03m £4.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £7.64k £4.46k £659 £2.29k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.96k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.63m £358.48k £547.74k £502.97k £627.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.60k £0 £4.32k £5.39k £7.04k