A ROCHA TRUST

Charity number: 288634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required