THE STOWMARKET AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We supply a monthly memory stick of local news and information to visually impaired
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 February 1984: Standard registration
- 18 June 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STOWMARKET NEWSTALK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422 | £332 | £56 | £4.02k | £746 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.04k | £2.12k | £1.91k | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 13 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window