THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' THE GREAT, THORLEY

Charity number: 288678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.56k £16.01k £5.72k £6.50k £2.24k
Total expenditure £26.87k £19.39k £14.66k £2.17k £1.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A