Governing document WATERAID
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1989, 24 SEPTEMBER 1997, 23 SEPTEMBER 1998, 9 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 4 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 16 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD THROUGH THE IMPROVEMENT OF WATER SUPPLIES, SANITATION AND ADVICE ON RELATED HEALTH MATTERS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE NATURE, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SUCH POVERTY AND SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.