WHEATFIELDS NURSERY FOR PRESCHOOL EDUCATION

Charity number: 288809
Charity reporting is overdue by 155 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 July 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 July 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 June 2017 On time Download