PLYMOUTH NATURAL HEALTH AND HEALING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Healing and provision of alternative remedies/therapies. - currently inactive
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 27 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Jenkins | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE NORMAN GLOVER | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anderson | Trustee | 21 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.85k | £181 | £5.05k | £304 | £265 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.48k | £11.27k | £4.93k | £84 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 21ST NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE AND THERAPIES, AND IN PARTICULAR HOMEOPAHTY, NUTRITION, NATURAL HEALING, ACUPUNCTURE, ACUPRESSURE, REFLEXOLOGY, YOGA, RADIONICS, RELAXATION AND MEDITATION FOR THE PEOPLE OF DEVON AND CORNWALL AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
DEVON, CORNWALL AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Heritage Court
Magdalene Street
GLASTONBURY
Somerset
BA6 9ER
- Phone:
- 07714552159
- Email:
- robert.scorpmoon@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window