Financial history FRIENDS OF BOLIVIA

Charity number: 288866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £8.99k £15.86k £27.33k £12.88k £21.50k
Total expenditure £11.13k £11.70k £30.06k £13.72k £9.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A