Accounts and annual returns CARE FOR LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST ANNE'S) COMMERCIAL ROAD TRUST (USUALLY KNOWN AS CARE FOR ST ANNE'S)

Charity number: 288889
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required