THE CAPTAINS FUND LONDON DIVISION NAVAL RESERVE

Charity number: 288990
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required