THE CAPTAINS FUND LONDON DIVISION NAVAL RESERVE

Charity number: 288990
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.71k £11.44k £4.32k £4.86k £28.04k
Total expenditure £8.76k £9.57k £10.47k £2.05k £1.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A