THE CAPTAINS FUND LONDON DIVISION NAVAL RESERVE

Charity number: 288990
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Captain Peter Baker RD DL RNR Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
COMMANDER P A N VOKES Trustee None on record
COMMANDER DIANA MARGARET MASON OBE RD DL Trustee None on record
Chief Petty Officer Evadne Gordon VR RNR Trustee 16 December 2020 None on record
Petty Officer Jeremy Hurst Blackburn RNR Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
COMMANDER TREVOR DUTT RD RNR Trustee None on record
LT CDR ROGER WESTON RD MA RNR Trustee None on record
Commander Gregory Young VR RNR Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Commander Alistair Louis Worsley RD JP RNR Chair 13 March 2018 None on record
Lt Cdr Stephen Bassett RD RNR Trustee 12 March 2019 None on record