BRECKLAND MASONIC LODGE NUMBER 8707 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 289013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply both the capital and income of the Benevolent Fund to or for the benefit of such poor, and distressed brother Masons or their poor and distressed widows and children or to or for the benefits of such Masonic Charities and all other institutions societies and objects as the Lodge shall in duly constituted meetings from time time direct.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,898
Total expenditure: £350

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Warwick Lowe Chair 08 March 2022
None on record
Joseph Thomas Clark Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Simon Neal Charnley Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £1.80k £1.12k £1.78k £1.90k
Total expenditure £600 £2.15k £0 £1.66k £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Masonic Hall
Bridges Walk
Thetford
IP24 2EF
Phone:
07876 702091
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available