TILES AND ARCHITECTURAL CERAMICS SOCIETY

Charity number: 289090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PENNY BECKETT Chair None on record
Dr Alan Swale Trustee 05 July 2014 None on record
Abigail Sarah Brown Trustee 02 July 2016 None on record
Benjamin Miller Trustee 04 July 2015 None on record
ROGER HENSMAN Trustee None on record
Georgina Grant Trustee 07 July 2018 None on record
MARK SPENSLEY WATSON Trustee None on record
Penelope Hampson Trustee 02 March 2019 None on record
DAVID HUTCHINS Trustee None on record
Dr Robert McRorie Higgins Trustee 02 November 2019 None on record
ANTHONY DAVID WATTS Trustee None on record
ELAINE GODINA Trustee None on record
LESLEY JANE DURBIN Trustee 05 July 2014 None on record