Trustees ST ELIZABETH HOSPICE (SUFFOLK)
Charity number: 289154

Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN TURNER | Chair | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mary Pretswell | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Lowe | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Monks | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andreas Hilger | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Craig | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Pickering | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pam Fenner | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BANKS | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Mackenzie | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Parkinson | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hogarth | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID BARNES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.