THE BRITISH CARDIAC PATIENTS ASSOCIATION ZIPPER CLUB

Charity number: 289190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 17 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 25 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 25 April 2017 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 25 April 2017 118 days late Download