THE BRITISH CARDIAC PATIENTS ASSOCIATION ZIPPER CLUB

Charity number: 289190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £62.72k £32.52k £34.10k £78.92k £46.49k
Total expenditure £60.06k £53.38k £36.96k £54.04k £141.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A