Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MATTHEW'S CHURCH

Charity number: 289204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MATTHEW JOHN FOY Chair 18 September 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW, ST. LEONARDS ON SEA
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARDS ON SEA, ST LEONARD AND ST ETHELBURGA
Received: On time
HASTINGS & ST LEONARDS CAP GROUP
Overdue by 261 days
Timothy David Blythe Trustee 21 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW, ST. LEONARDS ON SEA
Received: On time
Shirley Joan Coulthard Trustee 15 May 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW, ST. LEONARDS ON SEA
Received: On time
Nigel Ian Brett Trustee 04 September 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW, ST. LEONARDS ON SEA
Received: On time
THOMAS WALTER MORGAN Trustee 07 May 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW, ST. LEONARDS ON SEA
Received: On time