Accounts and annual returns MUSIC AT OXFORD

Charity number: 289324
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 2 days Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window