Trustees MUSIC AT OXFORD

Charity number: 289324
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Rivers Chair 18 July 2018
None on record
Dr Peter John Alsop Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Professor Margaret Maden Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Ian Charles Stewart Ritchie Trustee 27 January 2020
THE TENEBRAE CHOIR
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, FULHAM
Received: On time
JULIE BOND Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record