Governing document SANDWICH BAY BIRD OBSERVATORY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 31/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A)THE STUDY OF BIRDS THEIR DISTRIBUTION AND MIGRATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES OF THE BRITISH TRUST FOR ORNITHOLOGY. (B)THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA IN THE AREA OF SANDWICH BAY, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER AREAS ADJACENT THERETO AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CONSIDERED REASONABLE AND APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
SANDWICH BAY, KENT AND AREAS ADJACENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.