Financial history GREENBELT FESTIVALS

Charity number: 289372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.50m £1.86m £1.94m £812.58k £856.66k
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.83m £1.89m £703.38k £729.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £43.10k £41.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £434.46k £439.65k £460.68k £547.04k £487.40k
Income - Other trading activities £395.88k £488.91k £513.94k £5.01k £12.72k
Income - Charitable activities £621.27k £723.08k £723.20k £26.36k £115.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £157.05k £181.35k £191.08k £198.94k
Income - Other £51.10k £53.74k £62.33k £43.10k £41.67k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.43m £1.53m £445.90k £569.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £174.33k £399.70k £359.86k £257.48k £159.62k
Expenditure - Governance £22.39k £6.02k £26.22k £24.31k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0