GREENBELT FESTIVALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Greenbelt is an independent Christian charity working to express love, creativity and justice through the arts and contemporary culture in the light of the Christian gospel. Greenbelt holds an annual festival celebrating arts, faith and justice. Donations are distributed through small and medium-size grants to initiatives, inspired by faith, that liberate creativity in the face of injustice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income:
£2,492,446
Donations and legacies | £830.10k | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other trading activities | £398.15k | |
Investments | £198.95k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,552,889
Raising funds | £300.06k | |
Charitable activities | £2.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £300.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.25m |
People

10 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 1984: Standard registration
- 29 March 2022: Funds received from 1058376 WOOD GREEN MENNONITE CHURCH TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Anne Pittam-Smith | Chair | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN HUGH SILVEY | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon John Brown | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Louise Dawn Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Gretton | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Clare Chapman | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lucy Michelle Roberts | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Latchmore | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Molly Georgina Boot | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev David William Tomlinson | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Rajesh Solanky | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MATTHEW WILSON | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHINEMEREM SHARON ONYINYECHI MCDONALD | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £812.58k | £856.66k | £2.04m | £2.43m | £2.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £703.38k | £729.54k | £2.11m | £2.39m | £2.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.10k | £41.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £547.04k | £487.40k | £656.39k | £784.70k | £830.10k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.01k | £12.72k | £335.39k | £401.34k | £398.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £26.36k | £115.94k | £849.63k | £1.05m | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £191.08k | £198.94k | £203.19k | £198.96k | £198.95k | |
|
Income - Other | £43.10k | £41.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £445.90k | £569.92k | £1.84m | £2.05m | £2.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £257.48k | £159.62k | £276.71k | £342.15k | £300.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £33.60k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £43.86k | £39.77k | £34.27k | £28.48k | £24.03k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £840.55k | £966.02k | £640.69k | £870.69k | £591.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £600.08k | £594.34k | £333.63k | £515.69k | £292.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/08/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2015 as amended on 16 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO GIVE ASSISTANCE TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; TO PROMOTE AND CELEBRATE EXCELLENCE IN THE ARTS AT BOTH AMATEUR AND PROFESSIONAL LEVELS; AND TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF INJUSTICE AND ABUSE OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS)BOTH AT HOME AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NEST
CHURCH HOUSE
86 TAVISTOCK PLACE
KINGS CROSS
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02073290039
- Email:
- gbinfo@greenbelt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window