Trustees GREENBELT FESTIVALS

Charity number: 289372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sam Pittam-Smith Chair 25 November 2022
None on record
Nicholas George Gretton Trustee 16 July 2022
LOCAL WELCOME CIO
Received: On time
MELTON VINEYARD
Received: On time
Liz Chapman Trustee 06 November 2021
None on record
Katie Roberts Trustee 30 October 2021
None on record
Molly Georgina Boot Trustee 13 July 2019
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM
Received: On time
Georgia Latchmore Trustee 13 July 2019
None on record
Rev David William Tomlinson Trustee 16 March 2019
None on record
Ben Solanky Trustee 23 March 2018
None on record
GRAHAM WILSON Trustee 09 February 2018
None on record
CHINEMEREM SHARON ONYINYECHI MCDONALD Trustee 15 July 2017
THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN AID
Received: On time
ANDREW GRIFFITHS Trustee 15 October 2016
INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE MISSION UK
Received: On time
Dr Marika Rose Trustee 14 October 2016
None on record