Accounts and annual returns MUSLIM CULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 289380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late Download Open in new window