Financial history MUSLIM CULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 289380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £75.25k £39.46k £47.51k £57.54k £59.49k
Total expenditure £185.66k £112.16k £22.30k £12.51k £28.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A