Trustees CHRISTIAN WORKERS HOUSING TRUST
Charity number: 289495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Alexander Johnston | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Grace Haagensen | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Mackenzie | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shalene Elizabeth Pearce | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Hugh Doughty | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID JOHN TINGLEY | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GILMORE | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRYAN KENNETT | Trustee | 27 April 1984 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY ELIZABETH JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.