THE ASSOCIATION OF GUILDS OF WEAVERS, SPINNERS AND DYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Main activites of the Association, in support of its aims, are the running of Summer Schools, Exhibitions, other training events, the production of a quarterly Journal and the dissemination of information and resources to its affiliated Guilds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Switzerland
Governance
- 04 April 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Crowther | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Monk | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janette Matthews | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Lawrence | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Knowles | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Johnston | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Martin | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Fidler | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Easey | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Shannon | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ruth England | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Susan Maher | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.05k | £106.89k | £214.89k | £93.30k | £280.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.95k | £84.10k | £179.60k | £106.59k | £265.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1984 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2017 as amended on 06 Apr 2019 as amended on 13 Oct 2020 as amended on 19 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
(I) THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRAFTSMANSHIP IN HAND WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC AWARENESS AND EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTSMANSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Montrose
Tower Road
Ashley Heath
MARKET DRAYTON
TF9 4PU
- Phone:
- 07751815663
- Email:
- secretary@wsd.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window