THE FAKENHAM AND DEREHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289662
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)