THE FAKENHAM AND DEREHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £366 £1.48k £1.39k £1.66k £5.23k
Total expenditure £720 £1.43k £1.15k £1.03k £696
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A