DRY STONE WALLING ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 289678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE DRY STONE WALLING ASSOCIATION WORKS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CRAFT AND HERITAGE OF DRY STONE WALLING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IT PRODUCES A RANGE OF PUBLICATIONS AND OFFERS TRAINING AND AN ACCREDITED CERTIFICATION SCHEME FOR THOSE WISHING TO GAIN QUALIFICATIONS IN THE CRAFT IN ORDER TO MAINTAIN AND RETAIN THE IMPORTANT LANDSCAPE HERITAGE FEATURES OF DRY STONE WALLS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £241,042
Total expenditure: £226,607

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1987: Standard registration
  • 05 November 2017: Funds received from 1101605 SOUTH WEST ENGLAND DRY STONE WALLING ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • D S W A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL CLAYTON Chair 06 March 2021
None on record
TRACEY BLACKWELL Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Brian Hartley Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Martin Tyler Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
LYDIA NOBLE Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Cuthbert Noble Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Pamela Kirkup Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Dr Jack Taylor Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
PETER ISHERWOOD Trustee 06 March 2021
None on record
ANDREW LOUDON Trustee 06 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £291.86k £363.05k £197.35k £279.72k £241.04k
Total expenditure £255.78k £353.05k £180.55k £169.54k £226.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.00k £5.72k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DSWA
LANE FARM
CROOKLANDS
MILNTHORPE
CUMBRIA
LA7 7NH
Phone:
01539567953