THE FRIENDS OF ARKESDEN CHURCH

Charity number: 289741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 April 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required