THE FRIENDS OF ARKESDEN CHURCH

Charity number: 289741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.73k £2.11k £28.39k £18.35k £5.46k
Total expenditure £164 £360 £605 £3.53k £187
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A