CREEKSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 289744
Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 425 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 425 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 791 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 791 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 02 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required