THE BATH STONE QUARRY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 289752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

custodian of historic and cultural artefacts

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £1,595
Total expenditure: £3,880

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE UNDERGROUND QUARRY (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thurstan Alexei Yem Pollard Trustee 26 December 2020
None on record
Michael John Dodd Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record
NINA ANNE ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.97k £9.00k £5.15k £2.06k £1.60k
Total expenditure £11.11k £6.12k £9.19k £4.86k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HARDY HOUSE
HIGH STREET
BOX
CORSHAM
SN13 8NF
Phone:
01225744949
Website:

No information available