Financial history MAIDENHEAD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £1.49k £536 £588 £2.54k £895
Total expenditure £1.12k £1.63k £1.34k £1.72k £438
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A