Trustees THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF ENGINEERS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 289819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Ernest Joyce | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Vanessa Middleton Ramsay | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Ann Canning | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Martin Blair-Fish | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gordon Grier Thomas Masterton OBE DL | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr David J Hughes FREng | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cdre Barry Philip Stewart Brooks RN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Air Commodore Mark Hunt OBE | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Luke Diggins | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Air Vice Marshal Peter Liddell CB | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Michael Johnson FREng | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.