Accounts and annual returns DARTFORD PRIMARY ACADEMY FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 November 2021 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 September 2019 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required