Accounts and annual returns WEST LEA SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 289890
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2023 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required