Financial history THE FRIENDS OF JULIAN OF NORWICH

Charity number: 289918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £44.59k £108.30k £55.42k £22.65k £39.18k
Total expenditure £24.75k £39.13k £42.90k £19.75k £48.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.81k N/A