THE FRIENDS OF JULIAN OF NORWICH

Charity number: 289918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally-Anne Lomas Trustee 08 May 2018
BRAVE NEW WORDS Received: On time
Rev Richard Oliver Stanton Trustee 20 March 2019
THE PARMENTERGATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Overdue by 456 days
THOMAS CLABBURN CHARITY (FOR THE PARISH OF ST JOHN, TIMBERHILL) Overdue by 456 days
FELICITY GAY MATON Trustee None on record
Frederick Thompson CJN Trustee 08 May 2018 None on record
Gillian Dascombe Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
HOWARD GREEN Trustee 08 January 2014
THE JULIAN OF NORWICH PARTNERSHIP Recently registered
CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST FOR NORWICH AND NORFOLK LIMITED Received: On time
SHIRLEY MARGARET BUXTON Trustee
THOMAS CLABBURN CHARITY (FOR THE PARISH OF ST JOHN, TIMBERHILL) Overdue by 456 days
Lesley Mitchell Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Peter Colback Trustee 08 May 2016 None on record
Rev Robert Fruehwirth Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record