THE JOHN RICE CHARITY

Charity number: 289926
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAKIM MICHAEL RUSSELL WHITE Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
Mark Wyndham Thomas Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
NICHOLAS HULL Chair 17 April 2013 None on record
JENNIFER MARY HARDING Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
Oliver Holdsworth Gillett Trustee 09 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET LOTHBURY Received: On time
Rev WILLIAM JEREMY HUGH CROSSLEY Rev'd Preb Trustee 16 November 2000
SION COLLEGE Received: On time
Adrian Smallwood Trustee 25 April 2013 None on record