BOLTONS GARDEN ENCLOSURES

Charity number: 289951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2017 On time Download