THE PRINCE ANDREW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 290140
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £765.95k £1.00m £1.40m £1.42m £1.42m
Total expenditure £836.47k £998.49k £1.31m £1.33m £1.06m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £84.28k £49.21k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £641.98k £925.14k £1.38m £840.66k £582.71k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £554.71k £457.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.69k £26.09k £21.74k £22.32k £22.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £355.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £161.62k £69.98k £42.14k £575.58k £513.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £672.30k £916.24k £1.24m £732.20k £543.60k
Expenditure - Governance £30.59k £20.84k £27.35k £20.87k £46.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £49.14k £14.79k £0 £9.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £5.15k £5.16k £5.59k £5.67k £5.66k
Expenditure - Other £2.55k £12.26k £28.00k £20.50k £0