CARA IRISH HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290182
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4490 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4490 days
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On time
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 December 2006 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On time
Annual return 31 March 2005 27 January 2006 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 24 August 2005 On time
Annual return 31 March 2004 03 February 2005 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 24 November 2004 On time