THE ST ALOYSIUS CHARITABLE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to raise income from a range of ethical investments and then apply this income as a donation to St Aloysius' College, Glasgow to be used for bursaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 October 1984: Standard registration
- 13 December 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.21k | £48.14k | £55.02k | £51.60k | £52.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.14k | £92.64k | £81.17k | £79.54k | £62.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 14 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 14 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 29TH AUGUST 1984 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT OF NEW TRUSTEES OF 7 SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE SOCIETY OF JESUS WHERESOEVER AND WHATSOEVER BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window