Financial history WILTSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 290284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.90k £52.25k £43.28k £42.77k £42.45k
Total expenditure £57.02k £54.26k £57.77k £52.30k £33.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A