Governing document WILTSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 290284
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1999, 17 JUNE 2006, 20 MAY 2008 AND 20 JUNE 2009 as amended on 15 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF BRITISH FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO WILTSHIRE. (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESS ABLITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WILTSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.